Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo María Torres

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1730³BornAllo
15 Dec 178353.1AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
8 Feb 178453.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
23 Mar 181685.4DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo María Torres
Bishop Jerónimo María Torres (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 101, Number 522
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 9
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016