Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José González Laso Santos de San Pedro

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1727Born
21 Jul 176639.2AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
7 Sep 176639.4Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
1803²75.7DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José González Laso Santos de San Pedro
Bishop José González Laso Santos de San Pedro (born , died 1803) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBustillo de Cea

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 84, Number 422
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 340

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018