Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Biguezal

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1692³Born
24 May 175664.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
2 Dec 176270.6DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Biguezal
Bishop José Francisco Biguezal (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitoria
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Convent, Astorga, Diocese of Astorga

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 74, Number 364
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 166
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 5,978
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast