Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Sánchez Cabezón

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1684Born
27 Apr 175065.6AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
21 Jun 175065.7Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
27 Jan 176782.3DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Sánchez Cabezón
Bishop Francisco Javier Sánchez Cabezón (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTregajantes

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 68, Number 324
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast