Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Fernández Pantoja

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1706Born
9 Apr 175347.0AppointedBishop of León, Spain
6 Nov 176155.6DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Fernández Pantoja
Bishop Alfonso Fernández Pantoja (born , died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeseña

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 71, Number 345
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast