Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Cuadrillero Mota

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1726BornPalazuelo de Vedija
11 Dec 178054.8AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
20 May 178155.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
23 Mar 179771.1DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Cuadrillero Mota:
Bishop Francisco Cuadrillero Mota (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 98, Number 507

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013