Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Llano y Ponte

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1727BornAvilés
20 Nov 176942.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oviedo, Spain
20 Nov 176942.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
14 Jan 177042.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares
26 Sep 179164.4AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
29 Apr 180578.0DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Llano y Ponte:
Bishop Juan Llano y Ponte (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 253, and Page 322
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 86, Number 437
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015