Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Nolasco Mora Mora, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1732³BornBarcelona
1756²23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
12 Sep 179461.9AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
15 Feb 179562.3Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
1 Mar 1811³78.4DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Nolasco Mora Mora
Bishop Pedro Nolasco Mora Mora O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 112, Number 586
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016