Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Díaz Valdés

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1740Born
14 Sep 179858.0AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
24 Feb 179958.4Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
15 Nov 180767.1DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Díaz Valdés
Bishop Pedro Díaz Valdés (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGijón

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,851
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 119, Number 625
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast