Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Veyán y Mola

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1734³BornTamarite de Litera
15 Dec 178349.6AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
14 Mar 178449.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
30 Dec 181581.6DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Veyán y Mola:
Bishop Francisco Veyán y Mola (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 101, Number 523
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 10
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 440

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016