Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Llócer

Deceased

Bishop of Ibiza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1742³BornRibas de Fresser
1 Jun 179552.8AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
30 Aug 179553.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
24 Aug 180462.0DiedBishop of Ibiza, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clemente Llócer
Bishop Clemente Llócer (born , died ) Bishop of Ibiza

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 242
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 221
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 113, Number 590
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016