Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustaquio Azara, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1727³BornBarbuñales
7 Apr 178860.5AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
1 Jun 178860.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
12 Sep 179466.9AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
24 Jun 179769.7DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eustaquio Azara
Bishop Eustaquio Azara O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,495
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 106, Number 547
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 116, and Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016