Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilio Gil y Bueno

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1811BornPalazuelos
1835¹23.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 186150.4SelectedBishop of Huesca, Spain
23 Dec 186150.5ConfirmedBishop of Huesca, Spain
27 Apr 186250.9Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
12 Feb 187058.7DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basilio Gil y Bueno:
Bishop Basilio Gil y Bueno (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 429
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 169, Number 931

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013