Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Cirilo Uriz y Labayru

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1799Born
5 Aug 184950.0SelectedBishop of Lérida, Spain
20 May 185050.8ConfirmedBishop of Lérida, Spain
29 Sep 185051.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
16 Nov 186162.3SelectedBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
23 Dec 186162.4ConfirmedBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
7 Aug 187071.0DiedBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Cirilo Uriz y Labayru
Bishop Pedro Cirilo Uriz y Labayru (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona (-Tudela)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlite, Diocese of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 320, and Page 436
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 159, Number 871
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017