Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Biec y Belio

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1793BornLosanglis
Mar 1821³27.2Ordained PriestPriest of Huesca, Spain
18 Mar 185258.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
5 Sep 185258.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
13 Jul 185662.6DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Biec y Belio
Bishop Juan José Biec y Belio (born , died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 160, Number 879
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Dec 2016