Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Ortiz y Labastida, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1782Born
2 Jan 184865.7SelectedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
20 Jan 184865.7ConfirmedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
16 Jul 184866.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
23 Jul 185270.2DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Ortiz y Labastida
Bishop Vicente Ortiz y Labastida O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,227
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 555
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 155, Number 850
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018