Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Fort y Puig

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1763Born
1803¹39.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 182865.6SelectedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
15 Dec 182865.8ConfirmedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
8 Mar 182966.1Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
15 Oct 185592.7DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Fort y Puig
Bishop Jaime Fort y Puig (born , died ) Bishop of Barbastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLlivia

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 146, Number 792
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018