Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacio Ribes Mayor

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1773³Born
2 Jun 182855.0SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
15 Dec 182855.6ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
24 Feb 182955.8Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
23 Nov 183158.5SelectedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
24 Feb 183258.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
31 Oct 184067.4DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Ribes Mayor
Archbishop Ignacio Ribes Mayor (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 122, and Page 125
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 146, Number 791
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018