Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simón Rojas Guardiola y Hortoneda, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1773BornAleixar
27 Dec 179724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Jun 182754.1AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
4 Nov 182754.4Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
22 Aug 185178.2DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Simón Rojas Guardiola y Hortoneda:
Bishop Simón Rojas Guardiola y Hortoneda O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 144, Number 785

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013