Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Colmenares, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1766BornAutol
28 Sep 182458.7SelectedBishop of Lérida, Spain
20 Dec 182458.9ConfirmedBishop of Lérida, Spain
20 Mar 182559.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
20 Jun 183266.4DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Colmenares:
Bishop Pablo Colmenares O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 142, Number 771

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013