Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier García Casarrubios y Melgar, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1783Born
1807¹23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
22 Jul 182440.8SelectedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
27 Sep 182440.9ConfirmedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
21 Dec 182441.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
26 Oct 182542.0SelectedBishop of Tuy, Spain
19 Dec 182542.2ConfirmedBishop of Tuy, Spain
28 Jan 185571.3DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier García Casarrubios y Melgar
Bishop Francisco Javier García Casarrubios y Melgar O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLillo

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 343, and Page 380
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 142, Number 767
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,824, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast