Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Jesús Corcuera y Caserta

Deceased

Bishop of Vic, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1776Born
9 Mar 180529.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Oct 182448.6SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
20 Dec 182448.8ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
17 Apr 182549.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
3 Jul 183559.4DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Jesús Corcuera y Caserta
Bishop Pablo Jesús Corcuera y Caserta (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCádiz

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 395
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 143, Number 773
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018