Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Fleix y Soláns

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1804BornLérida, Spain
14 Jan 184641.3SelectedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
19 Jan 184641.3AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
16 Apr 184641.6ConfirmedBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
31 May 184641.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
19 Aug 186459.9SelectedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
22 Sep 186460.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
28 Jul 187065.9DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Fleix y Soláns:
Archbishop Francisco Fleix y Soláns (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,417
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 537
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 150, and Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013