Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Judas José Cardinal Romo y Gamboa

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1779BornCañizar
2 Sep 183354.7SelectedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
20 Jan 183455.0ConfirmedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
1 May 183455.3Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
16 Sep 184768.7SelectedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
17 Dec 184768.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
30 Sep 185071.7Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jan 185576.0DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Judas José Romo y Gamboa:
Cardinal Judas José Romo y Gamboa (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
  • a cardinal for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 308
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 130
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 150, Number 818

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013