Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Ruiz de Ausmendi

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1700BornCiempozuelos, Spain
28 Mar 175756.8AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
8 Sep 176666.3DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Felipe Ruiz de Ausmendi:
Archbishop Felipe Ruiz de Ausmendi (born , died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 199
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 76, Number 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013