Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Isidro Rodríguez Lorenzo, O.S.Bas. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1713Born
17 Dec 176451.7AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
28 Oct 176552.5Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
14 Dec 176754.6AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
12 Sep 178875.4RetiredArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1793²79.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidro Rodríguez Lorenzo
Archbishop Isidro Rodríguez Lorenzo O.S.Bas. (born , died 1793) Archbishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMóstoles, Spain

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 175, and Page 199
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 83, Number 418

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast