Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro José de Fonte y Hernández Miravete

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1777Born
4 Sep 181538.4AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
29 Jun 181639.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
28 Dec 183760.7ResignedArchbishop of México, Federal District
11 Jun 183962.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Pedro José de Fonte y Hernández Miravete (VIAF: 19542360)
Archbishop Pedro José de Fonte y Hernández Miravete (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinares de Mora, Spain
Ordained BishopMéxico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,816, Number 22
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 133, Number 717
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast