Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Martínez y Ocejo, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sonora, México

Note/Previous Titular See: (Bernardo del Espíritu Santo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1759Born
14 Apr 181757.8AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
27 Dec 181758.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
Feb 181858.6InstalledBishop of Sonora, México
23 Jul 182566.1DiedBishop of Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Martínez y Ocejo
Bishop Bernardo Martínez y Ocejo O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Sonora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComillas, Santander, Spain

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,817, Number 41
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,890
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 349
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 136, Number 732

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast