Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Torres y Amat

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1772BornSallent
1796¹23.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 183360.9SelectedBishop of Astorga, Spain
20 Jan 183461.4ConfirmedBishop of Astorga, Spain
1 May 183461.7Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
29 Dec 184775.3DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Félix Torres y Amat (VIAF: 23264289)
Bishop Félix Torres y Amat (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 93
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 150, Number 819
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016