Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco Castañiza Larrea y Gonzalez de Agüero

Deceased

Bishop of Durango


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1756BornMexico
18 Dec 181559.2AppointedBishop of Durango, México
4 Aug 181659.8Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
29 Oct 182569.0DiedBishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Castañiza Larrea y Gonzalez de Agüero:
Bishop Juan Francisco Castañiza Larrea y Gonzalez de Agüero (born , died ) Bishop of Durango

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 39
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015