Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquín López y Sicilia

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1764³BornCubel
1788¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 182460.4SelectedBishop of Coria, Spain
12 Jul 182460.5ConfirmedBishop of Coria, Spain
12 Oct 182460.8Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
9 Dec 182965.9SelectedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
15 Mar 183066.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
22 Oct 183167.8SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
24 Feb 183268.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
18 May 183268.4InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
24 Aug 183571.6DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín López y Sicilia:
Archbishop Joaquín López y Sicilia (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 122, and Page 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 141, Number 761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013