Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco Martínez y Castrillón

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1757³BornZaragoza
27 Aug 182466.8SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
27 Sep 182466.8ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
5 Dec 182467.0Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
28 Apr 182870.4SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
23 Jun 182870.6ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
11 Aug 182870.7DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Martínez y Castrillón:
Bishop Juan Francisco Martínez y Castrillón (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 250, and Page 296
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 141, Number 765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013