Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Fernandez de Castro Delgado, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin

Note/Previous Titular See: (Jerónimo de San Félix)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1758BornBaltar
1818²59.7AppointedMinister General of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
2 May 182466.0SelectedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
24 May 182466.1ConfirmedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
25 Jul 182466.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
5 Oct 182870.4DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Fernandez de Castro Delgado
Bishop Jerónimo Fernandez de Castro Delgado O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Albarracin

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 140, Number 757
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Jun 2016