Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Arbolí y Acaso

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1795BornCádiz
18 Mar 185256.4AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
5 Sep 185256.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
10 Sep 185357.9SelectedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
22 Dec 185358.1ConfirmedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
1 Feb 186367.3DiedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Arbolí y Acaso:
Bishop Juan José Arbolí y Acaso (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 280, and Page 294
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 161, Number 880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013