Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Manuel Joaquín Cardinal Tarancón y Morón

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1782BornCovarrubias
12 Sep 184765.5SelectedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
4 Oct 184765.5ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
2 Jan 184865.8Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
20 Jun 185775.3SelectedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
3 Aug 185775.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
15 Mar 185876.0Elevated to Cardinal
26 Aug 186280.4DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Joaquín Tarancón y Morón:
Cardinal Manuel Joaquín Tarancón y Morón (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 225, and Page 308
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 152, Number 830

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013