Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Rafael Domínguez y Valdecañas

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1799Born
1823¹23.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 185757.7SelectedBishop of Guadix, Spain
25 Sep 185757.9ConfirmedBishop of Guadix, Spain
6 Dec 185758.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
21 Dec 186566.1DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Rafael Domínguez y Valdecañas
Bishop Antonio Rafael Domínguez y Valdecañas (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucena, Diocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 164, Number 899
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast