Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel López Santisteban

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1783BornGuadix
17 Dec 184764.5AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
19 Mar 184864.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
30 Apr 185268.9ResignedBishop of Ávila, Spain
17 Apr 185975.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel López Santisteban:
Bishop Manuel López Santisteban (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ávila

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 154, Number 841

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014