Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Posada Rubín de Celis

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1768Born
1793¹24.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jun 182153.3SelectedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
24 Sep 182153.6ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
3 Feb 182253.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
18 Mar 182557.1ResignedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
12 Sep 184779.5SelectedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
17 Dec 184779.8ConfirmedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
22 Nov 185183.7DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Posada Rubín de Celis (VIAF: 316660083)
Patriarch Antonio Posada Rubín de Celis (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoto de Agues

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 320
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 136
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 140, Number 755
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,822, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast