Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Joseph d’Humières

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1753Born
18 Sep 177926.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 183278.3SelectedArchbishop of Avignon, France
24 Feb 183278.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Avignon, France
23 Sep 183279.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
21 Sep 183481.0DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Joseph d’Humières
Archbishop Louis Joseph d’Humières (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAurillac

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018