Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Rey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dijon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1773BornAix-en-Provence
4 Jun 180329.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 183258.1SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
24 Feb 183258.2ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
23 Sep 183258.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
24 Mar 183864.3ResignedBishop of Dijon, France
17 Aug 185884.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Claude Rey (VIAF: 19615875)
Bishop Claude Rey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dijon

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Aug 2016