Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Cascallana y Ordóñez

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1785BornSevilla
Sep 1809³24.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 184964.0SelectedBishop of Astorga, Spain
7 Jan 185064.5ConfirmedBishop of Astorga, Spain
12 May 185064.8Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
5 Jun 185165.9SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
5 Sep 185166.1ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
26 Feb 186882.6DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Nepomuceno Cascallana y Ordóñez:
Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Cascallana y Ordóñez (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,852
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 128, and Page 361
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 158, Number 867

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013