Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de los Ríos y Lamadrid

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1802Born
Dec 1828³26.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 185755.4SelectedBishop of Lugo, Spain
25 Sep 185755.4ConfirmedBishop of Lugo, Spain
28 Feb 185855.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
8 Mar 188481.9DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de los Ríos y Lamadrid
Bishop José de los Ríos y Lamadrid (born , died ) Bishop of Lugo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbiada de Argüeso
Ordained BishopSalesas, Madrid

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 350
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 164, Number 904
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017