Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Conde y Corral, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1814Born
1830¹15.3ProfessedMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
Sep 1838³24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
9 Sep 185743.0SelectedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
21 Dec 185743.3ConfirmedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
14 Mar 185843.5Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
19 Feb 186348.4SelectedBishop of Zamora, Spain
16 Mar 186348.5ConfirmedBishop of Zamora, Spain
1 Jul 188065.8DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Conde y Corral
Bishop Bernardo Conde y Corral O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeiva
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 458, and Page 601
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 165, Number 907
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast