Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paula Jiménez y Muñoz

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1807Born
23 Dec 186154.7AppointedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
27 Apr 186255.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
3 Jun 186962.1DiedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Jiménez y Muñoz
Bishop Francisco de Paula Jiménez y Muñoz (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBliecos, Diocese of Osma
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salamanca, Diocese of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 542
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 169, Number 930
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017