Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Montagut y Rubio

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1805Born
5 Oct 186358.6SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
21 Dec 186358.8ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
10 Apr 186459.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
30 May 186863.2SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
22 Jun 186863.3ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
9 Dec 187570.7DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Luis Montagut y Rubio
Bishop José Luis Montagut y Rubio (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbaida, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 431, and Page 510
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 171, Number 943
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018