Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mariano Benito Cardinal Barrio y Fernández

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1805BornJaca
1830¹24.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 184741.8SelectedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
17 Dec 184742.1ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
5 Mar 184842.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
3 Dec 186055.0SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
18 Mar 186155.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
22 Dec 187368.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jan 187468.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
20 Nov 187671.0DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Benito Barrio y Fernández:
Cardinal Mariano Benito Barrio y Fernández (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 185, and Page 579
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 153, Number 834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013