Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Hernández y Herrero

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1808Born
21 Dec 183325.9Ordained PriestPriest of Segorbe, Spain
21 Dec 186355.9AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
10 Apr 186456.2Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
20 Mar 186557.1SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
25 Sep 186557.6ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
19 Feb 186860.0DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Hernández y Herrero
Bishop Joaquín Hernández y Herrero (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLas Heras, Diocese of Segorbe
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 433, and Page 510
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 171, Number 942
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,864, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast