Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Benigno Carrión, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Pablo Benigno de Málaga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1798Born
29 Aug 185759.5SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
21 Dec 185759.8ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
7 Mar 185860.0Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
29 Nov 187173.7DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

MicroData Summary for Vicente Benigno Carrión (VIAF: 88725426)
Bishop Vicente Benigno Carrión O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMálaga, Spain
Ordained BishopRoyal, Chapel, Madrid

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 464
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 165, Number 905
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017