Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Blanco y Lorenzo, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1812Born
Dec 1834³22.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Oct 185745.4SelectedBishop of Ávila, Spain
21 Dec 185745.6ConfirmedBishop of Ávila, Spain
11 Apr 185845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
23 Jul 187563.2SelectedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
17 Sep 187563.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
28 Dec 187563.6InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
6 Jun 188169.0DiedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Blanco y Lorenzo (VIAF: 88625994)
Archbishop Fernando Blanco y Lorenzo O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlacePola de Lena, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,531
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 580
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 166, Number 910
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017