Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop JosÚ La Cuesta Maroto

Deceased

Bishop of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1806Born
2 May 186660.1SelectedBishop of Orense, Spain
25 Jun 186660.2ConfirmedBishop of Orense, Spain
21 Oct 186660.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
5 Mar 187164.9DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for JosÚ La Cuesta Maroto (VIAF: 88846129)
Bishop JosÚ La Cuesta Maroto (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVadocondes
Ordained BishopSalesas, Madrid

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 134
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1700, Page 173, Number 956
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1866, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017